Salami v. Eagen et al
Plaintiff: Michael Mohammed Salami
Defendant: Anthony King, Michael Eagen, Gwendlyn Warren, Heidi Washington and Sonia Warchok
Case Number: 2:2019cv11558
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #17 Order Staying Case on Michael Mohammed Salami Pris. No. 879045 at 9625 Pierce Road, Freeland, MI 48623. (MBea)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 Document Received from Michael Salami (SSch)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER dismissing defendant Washington, denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, denying the request to certify a class action #7 , denying the request for a declaratory ruling #8 , and denying the request to file a Complaint against the Court #12 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Service re #14 Notice of Appeal. (ATee)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Michael Mohammed Salami. (ATee)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Michael Salami regarding service (ATee)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST to file a complaint against Judge Steeh by Michael Mohammed Salami. (DPer)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $50.00 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Michael Mohammed Salami; with prison trust fund account statement. (DPer)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Michael Mohammed Salami (DPer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for declaratory ruling by Michael Mohammed Salami. (DPer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for class-action certification by Michael Mohammed Salami. (DPer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for preliminary injunction and protection order by Michael Mohammed Salami. (see fourth page of document) (DPer)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for Failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 7/1/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (KBro)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (KBro)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Mohammed Salami (KBro)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Mohammed Salami against All Defendants (KBro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salami v. Eagen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mohammed Salami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Eagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendlyn Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Warchok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?