Hamilton v. Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund et al

Plaintiff: John M. Hamilton
Defendant: Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund
Case Number: 2:2019cv11566
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
2 Judge: Linda V Parker
3 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiff to File Reply Brief in Support of his Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Reply due by 8/9/2019) Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Indemnification Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2. Superseding Indictment, #4 Exhibit 3. Plea Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4. Amended Criminal Judgment, #6 Exhibit 5. November 2008 Trust Amendment, #7 Exhibit 6. March 2015 Trust Amendment, #8 Exhibit 7. Fiduciary Insurance Policy, #9 Exhibit 8. 29 CFR 2509.75-4, #10 Exhibit 9. Spear, #11 Exhibit 10. CA Winery Workers, #12 Exhibit 11. Koresko) (LeVan, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Indemnification Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2. DOL Charging Letter, #4 Exhibit 3. Superseding Indictment, #5 Exhibit 4. Plea Agreement, #6 Exhibit 5. Amended Criminal Judgment, #7 Exhibit 6. November 2008 Trust Amendment, #8 Exhibit 7. March 2015 Trust Amendment, #9 Exhibit 8. Fiduciary Insurance Policy, #10 Exhibit 9. 29 CFR 2509.75-4, #11 Exhibit 10. Spear, #12 Exhibit 11. Ca. Winery Workers, #13 Exhibit 12. Herman, #14 Exhibit 13. Koresko, #15 Exhibit 14. Patio Enclosures, #16 Exhibit 15. 360Heroes, #17 Exhibit 16. McPeek, #18 Exhibit 17. CA Jones) (LeVan, Daniel)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John M. Hamilton, #3 Exhibit A to Hamilton Declaration - Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund Trustee Indemnification Agreement for Mr. John M. Hamilton, #4 Exhibit B to Hamilton Declaration - March 25, 2019 Tender Letter from Counsel for Hamilton to Pension Fund, #5 Exhibit C to Hamilton Declaration - May 9, 2019 Response to Hamilton's Tender Letter from Counsel for Pension Fund, #6 Exhibit D to Hamilton Declaration - May 15, 2019 Reply from Counsel for Hamilton to Counsel for Pension Fund, #7 Exhibit 2 - Appendix of Unpublished Opinions) (Rillo, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy H. Pearce on behalf of All Defendants. (Pearce, Nancy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. LeVan on behalf of All Defendants. (LeVan, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Soubly, Diane)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Soubly, Diane)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
May 29, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund(Board of Trustees of), Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund. (Rillo, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Diane M. Soubly appearing on behalf of John M. Hamilton (Soubly, Diane)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Sheehan on behalf of John M. Hamilton. (Sheehan, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele Slachetka on behalf of John M. Hamilton. (Slachetka, Michele)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Rillo on behalf of John M. Hamilton. (Rillo, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John M. Hamilton against Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund(Board of Trustees of), Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-7257711 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Rillo, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund
Represented By: Nancy H. Pearce
Represented By: Daniel G. LeVan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Hamilton
Represented By: Christopher J. Rillo
Represented By: Diane M. Soubly
Represented By: Michele Slachetka
Represented By: Christopher M. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?