LXR Biotech, LLC v. Kovach et al
Plaintiff: LXR Biotech, LLC
Defendant: Richard Kovach and Wade Dann
Case Number: 2:2019cv11601
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Richard Kovach. (Morris, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Richard Kovach to Show Cause Why Case Should not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 6/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (BSau)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to District Judge Sean F. Cox and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm)
May 31, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by Richard Kovach (Morris, Thomas)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Richard Kovach from Circuit Court for the County of Oakland, case number 19-173479-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7261773 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 2:18-cv-10674, Judge Sean F. Cox] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint) (Morris, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LXR Biotech, LLC v. Kovach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kovach
Represented By: Thomas R. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LXR Biotech, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Bruetsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?