Cavazos v. War-Ag Farms, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: JV(2), JRV, VMV, Santos Ortiz, JM(2), EMS, Pedro Rubio, JM(4), PR, JM(1), Eleazar Serna, Valeriano Ortiz, Maria Jesus Rubio Nieves, ES, CR, MR, JM(5), NM, Virginia Morales, Maria Carmen Rubio, MJS, Yolanda Cavazos, Monica Rubio, Esmeralda Rubio, JV(1), Maria Del Carmen Mendoza de Rubio, SSS, JV(3), JM(3), JM (4), JM (2), JV (1), JM (3), JV (3), JM (5), JM (1) and JV (2)
Defendant: War-Ag Farms, LLC, Spud Factory, LLC, D and D Warner Land, LLC and Dee Ann Warner
Case Number: 2:2019cv11635
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jordan Elizabeth McClain appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McClain, Jordan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. D and D Warner Land, LLC waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McClain, Jordan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Dee Ann Warner waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McClain, Jordan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Spud Factory, LLC waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McClain, Jordan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. War-Ag Farms, LLC waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McClain, Jordan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *D and D Warner Land, LLC* (ATee)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Dee Ann Warner* (ATee)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Spud Factory, LLC* (ATee)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *War-Ag Farms, LLC* (ATee)
June 10, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs PR, CR, MR, Maria Del Carmen Mendoza de Rubio, Virginia Morales, JM (1), JM (2), JM (3), JM (4), JM (5), NM, Santos Ortiz, Valeriano Ortiz, Esmeralda Rubio, JV (1), JV (2), JV (3), VMV, JRV, Maria Carmen Rubio, Monica Rubio, Pedro Rubio, Maria Jesus Rubio Nieves, Eleazar Serna, EMS, ES, MJS, SSS. Reason: The party was incorrectly added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Moberg, Kara)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *D and D Warner Land, LLC, Spud Factory, LLC d/b/a DuRussels' Potato Farm, War-Ag Farms, LLC, Dee Ann Warner* (SKra) Modified on 6/10/2019 (ATee). [SUMMONSES ISSUED ON 6/10/19 - PARTY NAMES WERE IN WRONG ORDER - PARTIES RE-ADDED TO THE CASE]
June 5, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendants War-Ag Farms, LLC, Spud Factory, LLC d/b/a DuRussels' Potato Farm, D and D Warner Land, LLC, Dee Ann Warner. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Moberg, Kara)
June 4, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
June 4, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Kara K. Moberg re #1 Complaint. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7265907 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw, Michigan - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw, Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Moberg, Kara) Modified on 6/4/2019 (DWor). [COMPLAINT FILED AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavazos v. War-Ag Farms, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JV(2)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JRV
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VMV
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Ortiz
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM(2)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMS
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Rubio
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM(4)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PR
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM(1)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleazar Serna
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeriano Ortiz
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Jesus Rubio Nieves
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ES
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CR
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM(5)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NM
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Morales
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Carmen Rubio
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJS
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Cavazos
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Rubio
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Rubio
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JV(1)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Mendoza de Rubio
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSS
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JV(3)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM(3)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM (4)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM (2)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JV (1)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM (3)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JV (3)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM (5)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM (1)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JV (2)
Represented By: Kara K. Moberg
Represented By: Jordan Elizabeth McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: War-Ag Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spud Factory, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D and D Warner Land, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Ann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?