Traffic Jam and Snug of Michigan, Inc., v. Blake Farms Hard Apple Cider, LLC
Plaintiff: Traffic Jam and Snug of Michigan, Inc., a Michigan corporation
Defendant: Blake Farms Hard Apple Cider, LLC a Michigan limited liability company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11638
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh Discovery Plan due 8/14/19 (MBea)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Blake Farms Hard Apple Cider, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Infante, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Infante on behalf of Blake Farms Hard Apple Cider, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Infante, Joseph)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Schooff, George)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: George T. Schooff. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Blake Farms Hard Apple Cider, LLC a Michigan limited liability company served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Schooff, George)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Blake Farms Hard Apple Cider, LLC a Michigan limited liability company* (LGra)
June 5, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Blake Farms Hard Apple Cider, LLC a Michigan limited liability company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7266734 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A) (Schooff, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traffic Jam and Snug of Michigan, Inc., v. Blake Farms Hard Apple Cider, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Farms Hard Apple Cider, LLC a Michigan limited liability company
Represented By: Joseph Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traffic Jam and Snug of Michigan, Inc., a Michigan corporation
Represented By: George T. Schooff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?