O'Neill et al v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,
Plaintiff: Alfonso V. O'Neill and Judy A. O'Neill
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,
Case Number: 2:2019cv11647
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of No Conflict. (BSau)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Striking Stipulation and Order #9 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BSau)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and/or File Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order) (Weisberg, Robert) Modified on 7/31/2019 (BSau).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING CERTIFICATION REQUIREMENTS. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BSau)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Turbiak on behalf of All Defendants. (Turbiak, Emily)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Haladyna, Kelley)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelley M. Haladyna on behalf of All Defendants. (Haladyna, Kelley)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued by All Plaintiffs (Weisberg, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,, by All Plaintiffs (Weisberg, Robert)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, * (LGra)
June 5, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7267533 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne, MI - County Where Action Arose: Wayne, MI - County of 1st Defendant: New York, NY. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Weisberg, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neill et al v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,
Represented By: Kelley M. Haladyna
Represented By: Emily L. Turbiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso V. O'Neill
Represented By: Robert A. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy A. O'Neill
Represented By: Robert A. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?