Bigland v. FCA North America Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Reid Bigland
Defendant: FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA US LLC and Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11659
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case , #24 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief that Exceeds the Page Limit re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case , #23 Response to Motion, Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Chart, #3 Exhibit Unpublished Decisions) (Jordan, Julia)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #22 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Reid Bigland, #24 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief that Exceeds the Page Limit re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case , #23 Response to Motion, filed by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V., FCA North America Holdings LLC. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief that Exceeds the Page Limit re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case , #23 Response to Motion, by All Defendants. (Jordan, Julia)
July 17, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Transfer Case under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a), and, Alternatively, to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Reid Bigland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Unpublished Cases) (Gordon, Deborah)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Reid Bigland. (Gordon, Deborah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response re #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Reid Bigland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email) (Gordon, Deborah)
July 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct , #18 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing reset for 10/3/2019 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Adams v Wilmington, #3 Exhibit BE Tech v Spark, #4 Exhibit Barrett v Lucent, #5 Exhibit Connolly v Remkes, #6 Exhibit Daly v Citigroup, #7 Exhibit Gale v Dept of Labor, #8 Exhibit Getman v Admin Review, #9 Exhibit Groeb Farms v Wolff, #10 Exhibit Hartzman v Wells Fargo, #11 Exhibit In re Nintendo, #12 Exhibit Kantin v Metro Life, #13 Exhibit Lebron v Am Intl Group, #14 Exhibit Mackall v Colvin, #15 Exhibit Martin v Wyndham, #16 Exhibit Masck v Sports Ill, #17 Exhibit Radu v Lear Corp, #18 Exhibit Reamer v Dept of Labor, #19 Exhibit Stone v Bd of Directors, #20 Exhibit Wallender v Canadian) (Jordan, Julia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING on #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct , #18 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case by FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - FCA EIP 2014-10-10, #3 Exhibit 2 - June 19 2015 RSU Award_Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 - June 19 2015 PSU Award_Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - Bigland employment agreement, #6 Exhibit 5 - Annual Bonus Plan, #7 Exhibit 6 - Case Management Statistics 2018 (Mich and Del only), #8 Exhibit 7 - AAA Employment Due Process Protocol, #9 Exhibit 8 - Androb, #10 Exhibit 9 - Auld, #11 Exhibit 10 - Beijing Fito, #12 Exhibit 11 - Boling, #13 Exhibit 12 - Braman, #14 Exhibit 13 - Cliffs, #15 Exhibit 14 - Com-Serv, #16 Exhibit 15 - Fagbeyiro, #17 Exhibit 16 - Family Wireless, #18 Exhibit 17 - Garrett, #19 Exhibit 18 - Hisey, #20 Exhibit 19 - IFM, #21 Exhibit 20 - Integrated Mgmt, #22 Exhibit 21 - Kessler, #23 Exhibit 22 - Kruchoski, #24 Exhibit 23 - Lanier, #25 Exhibit 24 - McCusker, #26 Exhibit 25 - MegaCorp, #27 Exhibit 26 - Quarum, #28 Exhibit 27 - Rader, #29 Exhibit 28 - Relume, #30 Exhibit 29 - Ricketts, #31 Exhibit 30 - Riedstra, #32 Exhibit 31 - Rosado, #33 Exhibit 32 - Thomas, #34 Exhibit 33 - Transport Sys v Amazon, #35 Exhibit 34 - Transport Sys v Pace, #36 Exhibit 35 - Wilson) (Jordan, Julia)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Reid Bigland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) (Gordon, Deborah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V. identifying Other Affiliate CNH Industrial N.V., Other Affiliate Exor N.V., Other Affiliate Ferrari N.V., Other Affiliate Juventus Football Club for Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V.. (Cranmer, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V.. (Cranmer, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Eden Cohen on behalf of Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V.. (Cohen, Jacob)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Marie Jordan on behalf of Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V.. (Jordan, Julia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Gordon, Deborah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued for *Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V.* (SKra)
June 13, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V.. (Gordon, Deborah)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Reid Bigland against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Gordon, Deborah)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: DISQUALIFICATION OF JUDGE and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson to District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (NAhm)
June 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor on behalf of Reid Bigland. (Taylor, Elizabeth)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah L. Gordon on behalf of Reid Bigland. (Gordon, Deborah)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for FCA US LLC. (Cranmer, Thomas)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCA North America Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for FCA North America Holdings LLC. (Cranmer, Thomas)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA US LLC. (Cranmer, Thomas)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Eden Cohen on behalf of FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA US LLC. (Cohen, Jacob)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Marie Jordan on behalf of FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA US LLC. (Jordan, Julia)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC, FCA North America Holdings LLC from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-174165-CD. Receipt No: 0645-7270490 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summonses, #4 Exhibit C - Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration) (Jordan, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigland v. FCA North America Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA North America Holdings LLC
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Represented By: Jacob Eden Cohen
Represented By: Julia Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Represented By: Jacob Eden Cohen
Represented By: Julia Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V.
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Represented By: Jacob Eden Cohen
Represented By: Julia Marie Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reid Bigland
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor
Represented By: Deborah L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?