Stern v. YourEncore, Inc.
Plaintiff: Theresa Stern
Defendant: YourEncore, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11747
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (MarW)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Stafford : Settlement Conference to be conducted during the month of October 2019. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/29/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/28/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2020 03:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Bench Trial set for 6/15/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau)
July 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Scheduling Conference held on 7/29/2019. (LSau)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 10:30 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Nichols, Courtney)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by YourEncore, Inc. (Nichols, Courtney)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by YourEncore, Inc.. (Nichols, Courtney)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by YourEncore, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 2019-006012-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7280570 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Email) (Nichols, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stern v. YourEncore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YourEncore, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney L. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Stern
Represented By: Alexander Stotland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?