Wyman
Appellee: Samuel D. Sweet
Appellant: Michael E. Tindall and Barbara Duggan
In Re: Christopher D. Wyman
Case Number: 2:2019cv11756
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2019 re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Barbara Duggan, Michael E. Tindall. filed by Michael E. Tindall, Barbara Duggan Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (LSau)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elie Bejjani on behalf of Barbara Duggan. (Bejjani, Elie)
June 21, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Elie Bejjani, at 6 Parklane Blvd. Suite 600, Dearborn, MI 48126. (LSau)
June 21, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Michael E. Tindall at 18530 Mack Ave. Suite 430, Detroit, MI 48236. (LSau)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING on #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Barbara Duggan, Michael E. Tindall.. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 04:15 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY to response re #1 MOTION to withdraw reference filed by Michael E. Tindall. (DPer)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBITS in support of #1 Motion to withdraw reference by Michael E. Tindall (DPer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Barbara Duggan, Michael E. Tindall. and Brief in Support and to Stay Further Proceedings in the Bankruptcy Court and also to Expedite Hearing on this Motion filed by Samuel D. Sweet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G) (Sweet, Samuel)
June 13, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Documents on Elie Bejjani and Michael E. Tindall (VLun)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of Motion to Withdraw Reference (VLun)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Barbara Duggan and Michael E. Tindall. (VLun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Samuel D. Sweet
Represented By: Samuel D. Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael E. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barbara Duggan
Represented By: Elie Bejjani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Christopher D. Wyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?