Chamberlain v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Chamberlain
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11758
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 9:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeffrey Chamberlain (Peri, Bradley)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeffrey Chamberlain (Peri, Bradley)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Jeffrey Chamberlain (Peri, Bradley) Modified on 7/10/2019 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "PLAINITFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES"]
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Shreve, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Menard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Menard, Inc. for Menard, Inc.. (Shreve, Mark)
June 13, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Menard, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-008075-NO. Receipt No: 0645-7282484 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-CSC Service of Process) (Shreve, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamberlain v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Chamberlain
Represented By: Bradley M. Peri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?