Rutues-Burns v. Bank of America Corporation
Plaintiff: Chawanne Rutues-Burns
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv11767
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America Corporation (Rheaume, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexandra C. Markel appearing on behalf of Bank of America Corporation (Markel, Alexandra)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Bank of America Corporation waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Rheaume, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of Bank of America Corporation. (Rheaume, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Bank of America Corporation* (SKra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chawanne Rutues-Burns against Bank of America Corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7283184 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons) (Gomez, Octavio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutues-Burns v. Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chawanne Rutues-Burns
Represented By: Octavio Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra C. Markel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?