Lepley v. Begole
Plaintiff: Mr. Robert Lepley
Defendant: Brian Begole
Case Number: 2:2019cv11788
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Russell C. Babcock appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Robert Lepley (Babcock, Russell)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by Brian Begole. (Vander Laan, Allan)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Brian Begole to Answer #1 Complaint. (Responsive pleading due by 8/2/2019.) Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (MacKay, K)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley C. Yanalunas on behalf of Brian Begole. (Yanalunas, Bradley)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan C. Vander Laan on behalf of Brian Begole. (Vander Laan, Allan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Preliminary WITNESS LIST by All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brian Begole served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Mastromarco, Victor)
June 17, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Brian Begole* (SKra)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7285728 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Michigan - County Where Action Arose: Shiawassee - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Mastromarco, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lepley v. Begole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Robert Lepley
Represented By: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
Represented By: Russell C. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Begole
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Bradley C. Yanalunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?