Ingram v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: James Bazelle Ingram
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer and Joseph Gasper
Case Number: 2:2019cv11791
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)
June 25, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #5 Directing Service by the US Marshal on James Bazelle Ingram at 4201 Somersetq, Detroit MI 48224. (MBea)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by James Bazelle Ingram. (DPer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Bazelle Ingram against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bazelle Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?