Premier Financial Consulting v. HMR Funding LLC et al
Plaintiff: Premier Financial Consulting
Defendant: HMR Funding LLC and Velocity Medical Receivables
Case Number: 2:2019cv11831
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Referral Agree, #2 Exhibit B - Confidential Non-Disclose, #3 Exhibit C - Emails with Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Second Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - First Declaration) (Burkholder, Evan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Premier Financial Consulting. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Rubinstein, Jan)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Striking 6 Response to Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
June 29, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by HMR Funding LLC, Velocity Medical Receivables (Burkholder, Evan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Change Venue by HMR Funding LLC, Velocity Medical Receivables. (Attachments: #1 EX 1 State Ct Complaint, #2 EX 2 State Ct Amended Complaint, #3 EX 3 Non-Disclosure Agree, #4 EX 4 Referral Fee Agree) (Burkholder, Evan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan A. Burkholder on behalf of HMR Funding LLC, Velocity Medical Receivables. (Burkholder, Evan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Velocity Medical Receivables, HMR Funding LLC (AMENDED NOTICE) from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 19-1516-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7293485 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (Burkholder, Evan)
June 20, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Velocity Medical Receivables, HMR Funding LLC from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 19-1516-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7291442 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C) (Burkholder, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier Financial Consulting v. HMR Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Financial Consulting
Represented By: Jan J. Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMR Funding LLC
Represented By: Evan A. Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Medical Receivables
Represented By: Evan A. Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?