Phillips v. Smithsonian Institution
Plaintiff: Artie Dale Phillips
Defendant: Smithsonian Institution and Lake Group Media, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11852
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Lake Group Media, Inc. waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Fraietta, Philip)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lake Group Media, Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Fraietta, Philip)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case's Caption filed by Artie Dale Phillips and terminating Smithsonian Institution. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case's Caption by Artie Dale Phillips. (Hedin, Frank)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Lake Group Media, Inc.* (SKra)
July 25, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Lake Group Media, Inc.. (Hedin, Frank)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Artie Dale Phillips against Lake Group Media, Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B, #3 Exhibit - C, #4 Exhibit - D) (Hedin, Frank)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Smithsonian Institution served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Fraietta, Philip)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank S. Hedin on behalf of Artie Dale Phillips. (Hedin, Frank)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nick Suciu, III on behalf of Artie Dale Phillips. (Suciu, Nick)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Smithsonian Institution* (LGra)
June 24, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Artie Dale Phillips against Smithsonian Institution with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7295270 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: District of Columbia. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Smithsonian Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artie Dale Phillips
Represented By: Philip L. Fraietta
Represented By: Frank S. Hedin
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithsonian Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Group Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?