RGIS, LLC v. GERDES
Plaintiff: RGIS, LLC
Defendant: KEITH GERDES
Case Number: 2:2019cv11866
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 and Denying Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Adjournment of Preliminary Injunction Hearing #9 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative For Stay; and to Adjourn All Dates Related to RGIS, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by RGIS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Priscilla Messir, #2 Exhibit B - 7/9/19 Order from Superior Ct. of California, #3 Exhibit C - Unreported Cases) (Lowe, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2019 re #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Adjourn #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion filed by KEITH GERDES and #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RGIS, LLC Disposition: Motion For Preliminary Injunction taken under advisement; Ex Parte Motion to Adjourn denied (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (MacKay, K)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Adjourn #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion filed by RGIS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order) (Lowe, Timothy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING on #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Adjourn #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion . Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION to Adjourn #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion by KEITH GERDES. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Eastman Outdoors, Inc. v. Serene Innovations, Inc., #3 Exhibit B - Action Freight Serv., LLC v. Thorne) (Sano, Hideaki)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING on #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative For Stay; and to Adjourn All Dates Related to RGIS, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 03:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative For Stay; and to Adjourn All Dates Related to RGIS, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by KEITH GERDES. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint filed in Superior Court of CA, #3 Exhibit 2 - Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200 et seq., #4 Exhibit 3 - RGIS Motion to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings, #5 Exhibit 4 - Pelochino Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 - Gerdes Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 - Cherry Ridge, L.L.C. v. Canton Charter Twp., #8 Exhibit 7 - Application Group, Inc. v. Hunter Group, Inc, #9 Exhibit 8 - Currie Medical Specialties, Inc. v. Bowen, #10 Exhibit 9 - Verdugo v. Alliantgroup, #11 Exhibit 10 - America Online, Inc. v. Superior Court, #12 Exhibit 11 - Adobe Sys. v. James, #13 Exhibit 12 - List of CA office of RGIS from website, #14 Exhibit 13 - Cal. Civ. 3426.3, #15 Exhibit 14 - Miles v Deutsche Bank Nat. Trust Co, #16 Exhibit 15 - Huong Que, Inc. v. Luu, #17 Exhibit 16 - Arata Equip. Co. v. Lodal, Inc, #18 Exhibit 17 - July 9, 2019 Order of the Superior Court of CA, #19 Exhibit 18 - Proof of Service of California Complaint on RGIS, #20 Exhibit 19 - 1-800 Remodel, Inc. v. Bodor) (Sano, Hideaki)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hideaki Sano on behalf of KEITH GERDES. (Sano, Hideaki)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by RGIS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of P. Messir, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of R. Silber) (Lowe, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by RGIS, LLC (Lowe, Timothy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *KEITH GERDES* (SKra)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by RGIS, LLC against KEITH GERDES. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7296029 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Cease and Desist Letter) (Lowe, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RGIS, LLC v. GERDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH GERDES
Represented By: Hideaki Sano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGIS, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?