Lombardi-Perwerton v. Lone Pine Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janet M. Lombardi-Perwerton
Defendant: Bryan Shaver, Joe Lockwood and Lone Pine Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11870
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Robert B. Holt, Jr re 11 Answer to Complaint. Docket entry was made on the wrong case. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Holt, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Janet M. Lombardi-Perwerton. (Feinberg, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to File Defendant's Responsive Pleadings. (Responsive Pleadings due by 8/9/2019) Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer C. Hill on behalf of All Defendants. (Hill, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Holt, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Holt, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lone Pine Association, Inc. served on 6/29/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Feinberg, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lone Pine Association, Inc. served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Feinberg, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Joe Lockwood served on 7/6/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Feinberg, Daniel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bryan Shaver served on 6/29/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Feinberg, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
June 25, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7296211 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Feinberg, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lombardi-Perwerton v. Lone Pine Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Shaver
Represented By: Robert B. Holt, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lockwood
Represented By: Robert B. Holt, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Pine Association, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Holt, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet M. Lombardi-Perwerton
Represented By: Daniel P. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?