United States of America v. Guile
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Pamela J. Guile and Pamela J. Anderson
Case Number: 2:2019cv11879
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT BY CONSENT. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (MacKay, K)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Striking Final Judgment by Consent (Dkt. #4 ) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BSau)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 [STRICKEN]CONSENT re #1 Complaint,, Judgment by United States of America (Schoenherr, Craig) Modified on 8/7/2019 (BSau).
June 26, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Pamela J. Guile* (SKra)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against Pamela J. Guile. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: United States - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Schoenherr, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Guile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela J. Guile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig Schoenherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?