Hodapp v. Oakland-Macomb Obstetrics and Gynecology, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Marybeth Hodapp
Defendant: Joseph Love, M.D., James McBride, M.D., Amy Heeringa, M.D., Sandra Morgan, M.D., Elise Wallace, M.D., Oakland-Macomb Obstetrics and Gynecology, P.C. and Shelley, a/k/a Shelly Sapick, M.D., a/k/a Seipick
Case Number: 2:2019cv11881
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
2 Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Elise Wallace, M.D. waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Shelley, a/k/a Shelly Sapick, M.D., a/k/a Seipick waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Oakland-Macomb Obstetrics and Gynecology, P.C. waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Sandra Morgan, M.D. waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. James McBride, M.D. waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Joseph Love, M.D. waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Amy Heeringa, M.D. waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Elise Wallace, M.D. waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Shelley, a/k/a Shelly Sapick, M.D., a/k/a Seipick waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Sandra Morgan, M.D. waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. James McBride, M.D. waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Joseph Love, M.D. waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Amy Heeringa, M.D. waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Oakland-Macomb Obstetrics and Gynecology, P.C. waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (McManus, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Bernard A. Friedman to District Judge David M. Lawson. (NAhm)
June 26, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7297096 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (McManus, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodapp v. Oakland-Macomb Obstetrics and Gynecology, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Love, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McBride, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Heeringa, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Morgan, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elise Wallace, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland-Macomb Obstetrics and Gynecology, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley, a/k/a Shelly Sapick, M.D., a/k/a Seipick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybeth Hodapp
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?