Berry et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-17 et al
Plaintiff: Cassandra D Berry and Cornelius S Berry
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Timothy Chervenak, PHH Mortgage and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-17
Case Number: 2:2019cv11912
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 9/4/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 8/14/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Darwyn P. Fair appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fair, Darwyn)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 8/1/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Darwyn P. Fair on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Fair, Darwyn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-17, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit B - Assignments, #4 Exhibit C - Sherriff's Deed, #5 Exhibit D - Correspondence from Plaintiff) (Ramin, Nasseem)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-17, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage (Ramin, Nasseem) Modified on 7/3/2019 (DWor). [DOCUMENT FILED BY PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION]
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-17, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage (Ramin, Nasseem)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas M. Schehr appearing on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-17, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage (Schehr, Thomas)
July 1, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-17, PHH Mortgage from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 2019-293 AV. Receipt No: 0645-7301647 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Pleadings and Orders Received by Defendants, #3 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - Assignments, #5 Exhibit D - Sherriff's Deed) (Ramin, Nasseem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-17 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Chervenak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee for GSAA Home Equity Trust 2006-17
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra D Berry
Represented By: Darwyn P. Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius S Berry
Represented By: Darwyn P. Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?