Houseman et al v. Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: David H Houseman and Margaret Houseman
Defendant: Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 2:2019cv11915
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Majzoub : Settlement Conference to be conducted during the month of December 2019. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/9/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/10/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 6/9/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/8/2019) (LSau).
August 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2019. (LSau)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason Benjamin Brown appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Jason)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 10:15 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. for Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brownell, Donald)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Brownell, Donald)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest and Certificate of Compliance from Wayne Circuit, case number 19-007527-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7302015 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Brownell, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houseman et al v. Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David H Houseman
Represented By: Jason Benjamin Brown
Represented By: Paul F. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Houseman
Represented By: Jason Benjamin Brown
Represented By: Paul F. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Donald C. Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?