Westfield Insurance Group v. Consumers Energy Company
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Group
Defendant: Consumers Energy Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11979
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
2 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Westfield Insurance Group (Connolly, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Dawkins Davis : Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/19/2020 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/19/2020 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain Jury Trial set for 9/15/2020 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (Refer to image for additional dates) (TMcg)
August 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain: Scheduling Conference held on 8/19/2019 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TMcg)
August 19, 2019 Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis pursuant to Administrative Order 19-AO-024. (SSch)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Maxwell J. Goss appearing on behalf of Westfield Insurance Group (Goss, Maxwell)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Milstone, Jason)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Aaron L. Vorce appearing on behalf of Consumers Energy Company (Vorce, Aaron)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference re #7 Notice to Appear (TMcg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain (TMcg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #5 Answer to Complaint by Consumers Energy Company (Milstone, Jason)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Consumers Energy Company. (Milstone, Jason)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Consumers Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent CMS Energy Corporation for Consumers Energy Company. (Milstone, Jason)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Consumers Energy Company served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Connolly, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Consumers Energy Company* (SKra)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Westfield Insurance Group against Consumers Energy Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7308046 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Medina - County Where Action Arose: Monroe - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Connolly, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance Group v. Consumers Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Group
Represented By: Matthew Martin Connolly
Represented By: Maxwell J. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Energy Company
Represented By: Jason M. Milstone
Represented By: Aaron L. Vorce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?