Adamo Demolition Group et al v. International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 et al
Plaintiff: Adamo Demolition Group and Adamo Group, Inc.
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 and James M. Sweeney
Case Number: 2:2019cv11999
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand. (Reply due by 9/6/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, James M. Sweeney. (Canzano, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand Action to Wayne County Circuit Court filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, James M. Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5) (Canzano, John)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time for (1) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's #7 MOTION to Remand, and (2) for Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Response due by 8/23/2019, Defendant's Reply due by 8/23/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Cuppetilli Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B: Gunn Affidavit) (Acho, Ronald)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER Allowing Plaintiffs to Exceed the Page Limit by up to Five Additional Pages Regarding Their Brief in Support of Their Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #1 Notice of Removal, by All Plaintiffs. (Acho, Ronald)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand Action to Wayne County Circuit Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1: Gunn Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2: Cuppetilli Affidavit) (Acho, Ronald)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, James M. Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3) (Canzano, John)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G. Acho on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Acho, Ronald)
July 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: John R. Canzano re #1 Notice of Remova. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted [ADAMO GROUP]. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150, James M. Sweeney re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jt Notice of Removal) (Canzano, John)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James M. Sweeney, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 Joint Notice of Removal from Third Judicial Circuit, case number 19-008077-cz. Receipt No: 0645-7310779 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Canzano, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamo Demolition Group et al v. International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 150
Represented By: John R. Canzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Sweeney
Represented By: John R. Canzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adamo Demolition Group
Represented By: Ronald G. Acho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adamo Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald G. Acho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?