Total Toxicology Labs, LLC v. United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary of et al
Plaintiff: Total Toxicology Labs, LLC
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary of and United States Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Administrator for
Case Number: 2:2019cv12000
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING on #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EKar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Administrator for, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. A1 Diabetes & Medical supply v. Alez M. Azar II, et al.) (Dodge, Lynn) [Supplemental Authority]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER on Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EKar)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Griswold Affidavit) (Dodge, Lynn)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER on Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (MacKay, K)
July 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Status Conference held on 7/31/2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (MacKay, K)
July 29, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B)
July 15, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Status Conference reset for 7/29/2019 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Marie Dodge on behalf of United States Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Administrator for, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary of. (Dodge, Lynn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DWor)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary of* (DWor)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *United States Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Administrator for* (DWor)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Total Toxicology Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Belanger, Jeremy)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Total Toxicology Labs, LLC (Belanger, Jeremy)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Total Toxicology Labs, LLC against United States Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Administrator for, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary of. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7310867 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. March 10, 2017 CMS Medical Records Request, #3 Exhibit 2. January 26, 2018 AdvanceMed Post Payment Review Results, #4 Exhibit 3. January 26, 2018 AdvanceMed Overpayment Determination, #5 Exhibit 4. Dr. Anthony Hayter Expert Report, #6 Exhibit 5. April 20, 2018 WPS Decision Letter, #7 Exhibit 6. August 15, 2018 C2C Innovative Solutions, Inc. Decision Letter, #8 Exhibit 7. September 18, 2018 WPS Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit 8. October 12, 2018 Total Toxicology Appeal and Request for ALJ Hearing, #10 Exhibit 9. Accounts Receivables from WPS, #11 Exhibit 10. January 28, 2019 U.S. Department of Treasury Collection Letter) (Belanger, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Toxicology Labs, LLC v. United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary of
Represented By: Lynn Marie Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Administrator for
Represented By: Lynn Marie Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Toxicology Labs, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy L. Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?