United Road Services, Inc. v. Randall et al
Plaintiff: United Road Services, Inc.
Defendant: Genesis Transportation Services, Inc. and Andrew Randall
Case Number: 2:2019cv12001
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Genesis Transportation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Unpublished Cases) (Ghannam, Amanda)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Eric Madison) (O'Shea, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING on #11 MOTION to Stay, #10 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh in courtroom #206 (MBea)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-United Road Services, Inc.s Corporate Filing, #3 Exhibit B-Defendant Andrew Randalls Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C-Genesis Transportation Services, Incs Corporate Filing, #5 Exhibit D-Unpublished Cases) (Taub, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Scott Tappan, #5 Exhibit 2017 Broker Agreement, #6 Exhibit 2019 Broker Agreement, #7 Exhibit March 14, 2019 Text Messages, #8 Exhibit Affidavit of David Koster, #9 Exhibit May 15, 2019 Email) (O'Shea, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Choon's Design, Inc. v. Tristar Prods. - unreported case) (O'Shea, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit TRO, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Daniel Pauley, #6 Exhibit Preliminary Injunction, #7 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Roehm v. Wal-Mart Stores-unreported case, #9 Exhibit Ford Motor Co. v. Collins - unreported case, #10 Exhibit LaSalle Group, Inc. v. Tiger Masonry - unreported case, #11 Exhibit Affidavit of Eric Madison) (O'Shea, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING on #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Response due by 8/2/2019 Reply due by 8/23/2019 Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Genesis Transportation Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Affidavit of James Stark, #3 Exhibit B- Unpublished Cases) (Ghannam, Amanda)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Ghannam on behalf of Andrew Randall. (Ghannam, Amanda)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Nacht on behalf of Genesis Transportation Services, Inc.. (Nacht, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Trial by Jury by Andrew Randall. (Taub, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Taub on behalf of Genesis Transportation Services, Inc.. (Taub, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Ghannam on behalf of Genesis Transportation Services, Inc.. (Ghannam, Amanda)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Nacht on behalf of Andrew Randall. (Nacht, David)
July 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-007725-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7310918 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Temporary Restraining Order) (Taub, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Road Services, Inc. v. Randall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Road Services, Inc.
Represented By: John J. O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Michael Taub
Represented By: Amanda M. Ghannam
Represented By: David A. Nacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Randall
Represented By: Adam Michael Taub
Represented By: Amanda M. Ghannam
Represented By: David A. Nacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?