Allen v. The Hanover Insurance Group
Plaintiff: Mr Kenneth Allen
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group and Danelle Watts
Case Number: 2:2019cv12024
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference Reset for 10/1/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. (DPar)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Exhibit List by The Hanover Insurance Group. (Brownell, Donald)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Preliminary WITNESS LIST by The Hanover Insurance Group (Brownell, Donald)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Donald C. Brownell appearing on behalf of The Hanover Insurance Group (Brownell, Donald)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER Substituting Attorney. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Danelle Watts. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Affirmative Defenses, #2 Document Continuation Jury Reliance) (Edmonds, Nathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nathan J. Edmonds appearing on behalf of Danelle Watts (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Edmonds, Nathan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Danelle Watts served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Keel, Alvin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. The Hanover Insurance Group served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Keel, Alvin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by The Hanover Insurance Group. (Murray, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas P. Murray, Jr appearing on behalf of The Hanover Insurance Group (Murray, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *The Hanover Insurance Group* (SKra)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Danelle Watts* (SKra)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Allen against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Fee waiver included in accordance with 28 USC 1916. Plaintiff requests summons issued. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Keel, Alvin)
July 10, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $400 - Receipt No. 0645-7313740 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
July 10, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Danelle Watts. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Keel, Alvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. The Hanover Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group
Represented By: Thomas P. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Donald C. Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danelle Watts
Represented By: Nathan J. Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Kenneth Allen
Represented By: Alvin L. Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?