Peers v. Fifth Third Bank
Plaintiff: Diane Peers
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv12034
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's WITNESS LIST by Diane Peers (Davidson, Syeda)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 WITNESS LIST by Fifth Third Bank (Waslawski, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Limited Disclosure of Privileged Documents. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Witnesses to be exchanged by 8/30/2019, Discovery Motions to be filed by 12/30/2019, Discovery due by 1/31/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/2/2020, Joint Final Pretrial Order due 6/8/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MLan)
July 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Scheduling Conference held on 7/31/2019. (MLan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 7/31/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Fifth Third Bank. (Waslawski, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fifth Third Bank identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Financial Corporation for Fifth Third Bank. (Waslawski, Daniel)
July 10, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fifth Third Bank from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-008130-CD. Receipt No: 0645-7314426 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Waslawski, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peers v. Fifth Third Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Peers
Represented By: Syeda F. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Daniel C. Waslawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?