Emergency Department Physicians P.C. et al v. UnitedHealthcare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emergency Department Physicians P.C. and Emergency Professionals of Michigan, P.C.
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare, Inc., United Healthcare Services Inc. and UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12052
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 10/1/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III, Jury Trial set for 3/16/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DPar)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 12/19/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. (DPar)
August 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 8/27/2019. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (DPar)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Mithani, Sonal)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Katheryn M. Lloyd on behalf of All Defendants. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Emergency Professionals of Michigan, P.C. (Giordano, Caroline)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Emergency Department Physicians P.C. (Giordano, Caroline)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by United Healthcare Services Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare, Inc.. (McKeever, Susan)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, (Response due by 7/31/2019). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Caroline B. Giordano appearing on behalf of Emergency Department Physicians P.C., Emergency Professionals of Michigan, P.C. (Giordano, Caroline)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sonal H. Mithani appearing on behalf of Emergency Department Physicians P.C., Emergency Professionals of Michigan, P.C. (Mithani, Sonal)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by United Healthcare Services Inc. (McKeever, Susan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company (McKeever, Susan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by UnitedHealthcare, Inc. (McKeever, Susan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare, Inc., United Healthcare Services Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-008235-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7316663 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit) (McKeever, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emergency Department Physicians P.C. et al v. UnitedHealthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Department Physicians P.C.
Represented By: Caroline B. Giordano
Represented By: Sonal H. Mithani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Professionals of Michigan, P.C.
Represented By: Caroline B. Giordano
Represented By: Sonal H. Mithani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Susan M. McKeever
Represented By: Katheryn M. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services Inc.
Represented By: Susan M. McKeever
Represented By: Katheryn M. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan M. McKeever
Represented By: Katheryn M. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?