Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Powerlink Facilities Management Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Powerlink Facilities Management Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12055
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 03:45 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Powerlink Facilities Management Services, LLC (Kotzian, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Powerlink Facilities Management Services, LLC. (Kotzian, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Kotzian on behalf of Powerlink Facilities Management Services, LLC. (Kotzian, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Campbell, Nedra)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Powerlink Facilities Management Services, LLC* (SKra)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Campbell, Nedra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Powerlink Facilities Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerlink Facilities Management Services, LLC
Represented By: David A. Kotzian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Nedra D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?