VCA Animal Hospital, Inc. v. Chahal et al
Plaintiff: VCA Animal Hospital, Inc.
Defendant: Amrit Chahal, G & N Building Management, LLC and Farmington Hills Veterinary Hospital, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12058
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Order To Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-K) (Artaev, Danila)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Clerk to Strike #15 Response to Motion and Remove Image. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 [STRICKEN] RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Order To Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-K) (Artaev, Danila) Modified on 8/21/2019 (BSau).
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Artaev, Danila)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to Answer or Respond to Complaint and Respond to Preliminary Injunction. (Responsive Pleadings due by 8/20/2019) Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Danila V. Artaev on behalf of All Defendants. (Artaev, Danila)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. G & N Building Management, LLC served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Boettcher, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Farmington Hills Veterinary Hospital, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Boettcher, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Amrit Chahal served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Boettcher, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Order To Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction by VCA Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Lease, #3 Exhibit B - Assignment, #4 Exhibit C - Assignment & Assumption, #5 Exhibit D - First Amended to Lease, #6 Exhibit E - 2019 Annual Report, #7 Exhibit F - Articles of Incorporation, #8 Exhibit G - Correspondence dated May 15, 2019, #9 Exhibit H - Correspondence Dated 5-29-19) (Boettcher, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *G & N Building Management, LLC* (DWor)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Farmington Hills Veterinary Hospital, Inc.* (DWor)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Amrit Chahal* (DWor)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Striking #2 MOTION for Order To Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 [STRICKEN] MOTION for Order To Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction by VCA Animal Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Lease, #3 Exhibit B - Assignment, #4 Exhibit C - Assignment & Assumption, #5 Exhibit D - First Amended to Lease, #6 Exhibit E - 2019 Annual Report, #7 Exhibit F - Articles of Incorporation, #8 Exhibit G - Correspondence Dated 5-15-19, #9 Exhibit H - Correspondence Dated 5-29-19) (Boettcher, Matthew) Modified on 7/11/2019 (RLou).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (VERIFIED) filed by VCA Animal Hospital, Inc. against Amrit Chahal, Farmington Hills Veterinary Hospital, Inc., G & N Building Management, LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7317996 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Lease, #3 Exhibit B - Assignment, #4 Exhibit C - Assignment & Assumption, #5 Exhibit D - Articles of Incorporation, #6 Exhibit E - Correspondence Dated 5-15-19, #7 Exhibit F - Correspondence Dated 5-29-19) (Boettcher, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VCA Animal Hospital, Inc. v. Chahal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VCA Animal Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Boettcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amrit Chahal
Represented By: Danila V. Artaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & N Building Management, LLC
Represented By: Danila V. Artaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Hills Veterinary Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Danila V. Artaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?