Snack Depot, LLC v. Grange Insurance Company of Michigan
Plaintiff: Snack Depot, LLC
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company of Michigan
Case Number: 2:2019cv12081
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE, (Stayed Until 10/1/2019). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
August 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 8/27/2019. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (DPar)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Walker, Jason)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Grange Insurance Company of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Loss, #3 Exhibit 3- Coverage Determination) (Walker, Jason)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Grange Insurance Company of Michigan to Show Cause why Failure to Prosecute: Show Cause Response due by 7/26/2019. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Grange Insurance Company of Michigan (Walker, Jason)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Grange Insurance Company of Michigan from Genesee County Circuit Court, case number 19-112527-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7322019 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Document Continuation Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Walker, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snack Depot, LLC v. Grange Insurance Company of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snack Depot, LLC
Represented By: Jo R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company of Michigan
Represented By: Jason Phillip Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?