Hegar v Lucas
Plaintiff: Hegar Vincent
Defendant: Lucas Officer
Case Number: 2:2019cv12084
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Lucas Officer. (Waddell, Brandon)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. Waddell on behalf of Lucas Officer. (Waddell, Brandon)
August 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lucas Officer served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Manville, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 16, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Lucas Officer* (SKra)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hegar Vincent against Lucas Officer with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7323523 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Manville, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hegar v Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hegar Vincent
Represented By: Daniel E. Manville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Officer
Represented By: Brandon W. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?