Allstate Indemnity Company v. Stelkic et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: G. B., We. B., West Oakland Realty, LLC, Monica Stelkic, Edwin Bridges, Kelly Bridges, Neil Stelkic and Wi. B.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12094
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
2 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Allstate Indemnity Company re #13 Reply to Response to Motion, #11 Supplemental Brief, (withdrawing both filings) (Berlin, Cary)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(1) by Monica Stelkic, Neil Stelkic, West Oakland Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Circuit Court Complaint) (Figa, Robert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Figa on behalf of Monica Stelkic, Neil Stelkic, West Oakland Realty, LLC. (Figa, Robert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response re #12 MOTION to Strike #11 Supplemental Brief, Filed in Violation of Local Rule 7.1 filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Berlin, Cary)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #11 Supplemental Brief, Filed in Violation of Local Rule 7.1 by G. B., We. B., Wi. B., Edwin Bridges, Kelly Bridges. (Grieco, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #9 Response to Motion, #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- USIC V COLE'S PLACE) (Berlin, Cary)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) filed by G. B., We. B., Wi. B., Edwin Bridges, Kelly Bridges. (Grieco, Jennifer)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit State Farm Fire and Cas. Co. v Stone, et. al, #3 Exhibit Liberty Mutual Ins Co v Estate of Bobzien by & through Hart, #4 Exhibit Orchard Hiltz &McCliment, Inc. v Phx. Ins. Co., #5 Exhibit Am. Modern Home Ins. Co. v Daniel) (Berlin, Cary)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) (AChu)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth F. Neuman on behalf of G. B., We. B., Wi. B., Edwin Bridges, Kelly Bridges. (Neuman, Kenneth)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Smith on behalf of G. B., We. B., Wi. B., Edwin Bridges, Kelly Bridges. (Smith, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) by G. B., We. B., Wi. B., Edwin Bridges, Kelly Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Underlying Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Allstate v Ballouz) (Grieco, Jennifer)
July 24, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (SSch)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *G. B., We. B., Wi. B., Edwin Bridges, Kelly Bridges, Monica Stelkic, Neil Stelkic, West Oakland Realty, LLC * (SKra)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Indemnity Company. (Berlin, Cary)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY ACTION filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7324474 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Oakland County Circuit Court, 2019-172968-NO, Judge Hon. Denise Langford Morris] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Berlin, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Stelkic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. B.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Grieco
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Represented By: Matthew D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We. B.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Grieco
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Represented By: Matthew D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Oakland Realty, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Figa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Stelkic
Represented By: Robert J. Figa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Bridges
Represented By: Jennifer M. Grieco
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Represented By: Matthew D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Bridges
Represented By: Jennifer M. Grieco
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Represented By: Matthew D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Stelkic
Represented By: Robert J. Figa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wi. B.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Grieco
Represented By: Kenneth F. Neuman
Represented By: Matthew D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Cary R. Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?