Spencer v. Oakland County Corporation et al
Plaintiff: William Sim Spencer
Defendant: Ronald H. Foon, Rebecca Ellis, Oakland County Circuit Court, Kenneth Tolbert, K. Donohue, Oakland County Friend of the Court, Oakland County Corporation, Rene M. Sturdavent and Suzanne K. Hollyer
Case Number: 2:2019cv12096
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #16 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on William Sim Spencer, 15283 Wallin Rd, Thompsonville, MI 49683-9104 (JCur)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #14 Application for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Service re #13 Notice of Appeal. (DPer)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs on appeal by William Sim Spencer. (DPer)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL by William Sim Spencer re #12 Order. Fee Status: IFP. (DPer)
July 29, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order on Motions for Reconsideration on William Sim Spencer, 15283 Wallin Rd., Thompsonville, MI 49683 (JCur)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #9 & #11 Motions for Reconsideration and dismissing Plaintiff's #10 Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for expedited reconsideration re #8 Order by William Sim Spencer. (DPer)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by William Sim Spencer against defendants (DPer)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for reconsideration re #4 Order dismissing case by William Sim Spencer. (DPer)
July 22, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order on Motion - Free on William Sim Spencer, 15283 Wallin Rd, Thompsonville, MI 49683-9104 (JCur)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying plaintiff's #7 motion for temporary restraining order, preliminary injunction, and expedited consideration. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Expedited Consideration Requested by William Sim Spencer. (SSch)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by William Sim Spencer. (SSch)
July 18, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order Dismissing Case, #5 Judgment on William Sim Spencer, 15283 Wallin Rd, Thompsonville, MI 49683-9104 (JCur)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00524. Modified on 7/16/2019 (VLun).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) [Transferred from miwd on 7/16/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT with jury demand against K. Donohue, Rebecca Ellis, Ronald H. Foon, Suzanne K. Hollyer, Oakland County Circuit Court, Oakland County Corporation, Oakland County Friend of the Court, Rene M. Sturdavent, Kenneth Tolbert filed by William Sim Spencer (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits) (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00524.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Oakland County Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald H. Foon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County Friend of the Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene M. Sturdavent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne K. Hollyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sim Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?