FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC v. CNC RECYCLING LLC
Plaintiff: FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC
Defendant: CNC RECYCLING LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12115
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Counter-Declaration) (Zack, David)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint. Answer due by 8/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Zack on behalf of All Defendants. (Zack, David)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Vacating #3 Order to Show Cause filed by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC. (Sawicka, Ewelina)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ewelina Sawicka appearing on behalf of FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC (Sawicka, Ewelina)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. CNC RECYCLING LLC served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Brady, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (EKar)
July 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *CNC RECYCLING LLC* (SKra)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC against CNC RECYCLING LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7329070 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit) (Brady, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC v. CNC RECYCLING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL-MOGUL IGNITION LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Brady
Represented By: Ewelina Sawicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNC RECYCLING LLC
Represented By: David M. Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?