Missilmani v. CITI Cards/Citibank
Plaintiff: Mustapha Missilmani
Defendant: CITI Cards/Citibank
Case Number: 2:2019cv12125
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Response to #1 Complaint. Response due by 9/25/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb on behalf of CITI Cards/Citibank. (Gottlieb, Amy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. CITI Cards/Citibank served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Abood, Norman)
July 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *CITI Cards/Citibank* (SKra)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mustapha Missilmani against CITI Cards/Citibank. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7329821 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 2:19-cv-11408, Judge George Caram Steeh] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Document Continuation Summons) (Abood, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Missilmani v. CITI Cards/Citibank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustapha Missilmani
Represented By: Norman A. Abood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITI Cards/Citibank
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?