Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP v. KRBL Limited
Plaintiff: Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP
Defendant: KRBL Limited
Case Number: 2:2019cv12158
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Vacating #7 Order to Show Cause Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Dated August 16, 2019 by Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP. (Stoychoff, Paul)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction re #7 Order to Show Cause. (DTof)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2019 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/16/2019) (DTof).
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Stoychoff, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated July 31, 2019 of the Court by Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP. (Stoychoff, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED by Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP of its Complaint by Right (Stoychoff, Paul)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2019 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *KRBL Limited* (DWor)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP against KRBL Limited. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7334326 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: India. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Stoychoff, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP v. KRBL Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP
Represented By: Paul M. Stoychoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRBL Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?