Chaplin v. Bauman
Petitioner: David Kent Chaplin
Respondent: Catherine Bauman
Case Number: 2:2019cv12205
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Judgment on David Kent Chaplin, Pris. No. 972233, NEWBERRY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY,13747 E. County Road 428, NEWBERRY, MI 49868. (JMcC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
September 13, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order Dismissing Case on David David Kent Chaplin, Pris. No. 972233, NEWBERRY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY,13747 E. County Road 428, NEWBERRY, MI 49868 (JMcC)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 8/20/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Kent Chaplin against Catherine Bauman. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation) (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaplin v. Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Kent Chaplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?