Carfagno v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Kevin Carfagno
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12214
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 3:19-cv-03125, filed 08/16/2019. (VLun)
August 15, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. (SSch)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of Florida for MDL 2885 (SSch)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-25) to Northern District of Florida for MDL # 2885. (SSch)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-25) for MDL # 2885. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
July 29, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *3M Company* (SKra)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kevin Carfagno against Kevin Carfagno with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7340315 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Out of Country - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] (Altus, Harvey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carfagno v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Carfagno
Represented By: Harvey Altus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?