Walker v. Henry Ford Health System et al
Plaintiff: Joe David Walker
Defendant: Original Tear Group, Steven Rand, Ashley J. Friess, Michele A. Johnson, Henry Ford Health System, Jeremee M. Wood, Jackson County Sheriff's Department, Tanya Sanford, David Halsey, Sara Poplawski, Hillary Jenski, Heather McLeod, Henry Ford Allegiance Hospital, Henry Ford Allegiance Health, Jackson, County of, Sameer Ahmed, Brent Walker and Robin A. Boucha
Case Number: 2:2019cv12343
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT Index of Unpublished Opinion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support and Proof of Service by Jackson County Sheriff's Department, Jackson, County of, Hillary Jenski, Steven Rand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Allen v Administrative off of Pennsylvania Courts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Crocker v County of Macomb, #3 Exhibit 3 - Estate of Wyatt v WAMU, #4 Exhibit 4 - Flayter v Wisconsin Dept of Corrections, #5 Exhibit 5 - Green v Inge, #6 Exhibit 6 - Harris v Kern Cty. Sheriffs, #7 Exhibit 7 - Klein v Univ. of Michigan Bd of Regents, #8 Exhibit 8 - Lamon v Tilton, #9 Exhibit 9 - Martin v Coppler, #10 Exhibit 10 - Patrick V Butzbaugh, #11 Exhibit 11 - Prichett v Office of Atty. Gen., #12 Exhibit 12 - Torp v United States, #13 Exhibit 13 - Williams v Lopez) (Beindit, Thomas)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief in Support and Proof of Service by Jackson County Sheriff's Department, Jackson, County of, Hillary Jenski, Steven Rand. (Beindit, Thomas)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Sameer Ahmed, Robin A. Boucha, Ashley J. Friess, David Halsey, Henry Ford Allegiance Health, Henry Ford Allegiance Hospital, Henry Ford Health System, Heather McLeod, Tanya Sanford, Brent Walker, Jeremee M. Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Feikens, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Joe David Walker. (SSch)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
August 9, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400.00 by Joe David Walker - Receipt No. DET124612 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Sameer Ahmed, Robin A. Boucha, Ashley J. Friess, David Halsey, Henry Ford Allegiance Health, Henry Ford Allegiance Hospital, Henry Ford Health System, Jackson County Sheriff's Department, Jackson, County of, Hillary Jenski, Michele A. Johnson, Heather McLeod, Sara Poplawski, Steven Rand, Tanya Sanford, Brent Walker, Jeremee M. Wood* (DPer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joe David Walker against defendants. (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Henry Ford Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Original Tear Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Rand
Represented By: Thomas David Beindit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley J. Friess
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Ford Health System
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremee M. Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Thomas David Beindit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Sanford
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Halsey
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Poplawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Jenski
Represented By: Thomas David Beindit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather McLeod
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Ford Allegiance Hospital
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Ford Allegiance Health
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson, County of
Represented By: Thomas David Beindit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sameer Ahmed
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin A. Boucha
Represented By: Jeffrey Feikens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe David Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?