Lowry
Appellee: Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative, LLC and Oakland County Treasurer
Appellant: Hakeem Lowry
Case Number: 2:2019cv12362
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Appellant Brief due by 11/15/2019; Appellee Brief due by 12/20/2019; Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/17/2020. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to the Designated Bankruptcy Record (VLun)
September 10, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of Receipt of Complete Record on Appeal (VLun)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Designated Bankruptcy Record (VLun)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Hakeem Lowry, Bankruptcy Court case number 18-55816. The appeal fee has not been paid. (VLun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Nicols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Oakland County Treasurer
Represented By: Kevin C. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Hakeem Lowry
Represented By: Scott F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?