Gutierrez et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Kidd, James Norvell, Marisella Gutierrez and Jimmy Harman
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12371
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
2 Judge: David M Lawson
3 Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *9/16/19*. Designated lead case number is *19-11044*. (SSch)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND SETTING INITIAL DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SSch)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 ORAL MOTION to Concur in Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel by Marisella Gutierrez. (SPin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 ORAL MOTION to Concur in Motion to Consolidate Cases by Marisella Gutierrez. (SPin)
September 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge David M. Lawson: Status/Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2019. (Court Reporter: Rene Twedt) (SPin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT STATEMENT of Plaintiffs and General Motors LLC for the September 11, 2019 Case Management & Scheduling Conference by General Motors LLC (Murphy, Jerome)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Albert Murphy on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Murphy, Jerome)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 1:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Denise Page Hood and Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis to District Judge David M. Lawson and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, ( Response due by 10/4/2019) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Alexander Levine on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Levine, Jared)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T. Sooy on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Sooy, Kathleen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of General Motors LLC. (Douglas, Stephanie)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Companion Cases (Cappio, Gretchen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. General Motors LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (McDevitt, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh to District Judge Denise Page Hood. (SSch)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Maxwell Holt Goins appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goins, Maxwell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ryan Patrick McDevitt appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McDevitt, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gretchen Freeman Cappio appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cappio, Gretchen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tana Lin appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lin, Tana)
August 12, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *General Motors LLC* (DWor)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -- CLASS ACTION filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7359231 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cobb County, Georgia - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County, Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Sarko, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kidd
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Maxwell Holt Goins
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Norvell
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Maxwell Holt Goins
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisella Gutierrez
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Maxwell Holt Goins
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Harman
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Maxwell Holt Goins
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Jared Alexander Levine
Represented By: Jerome Albert Murphy
Represented By: Kathleen T. Sooy
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?