Carter v. University of Texas at Dallas et al
Plaintiff: Geaniece D. Carter and Geaniece D Carter [E-filer]
Defendant: University of Texas at Dallas, George Fair, Barbara Ashmore and Carolyn Bray
Case Number: 2:2019cv12381
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S #16 Motion to Disqualify Counsel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #14 Motion to Amend/Correct- Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carolyn Bray, Barbara Ashmore, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Requiring Response to #17 Motion to Dismiss - Plaintiff's Response due by 10/28/2019 - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Barbara Ashmore, Carolyn Bray, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas. (Graydon, Scot)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Barbara Ashmore, Carolyn Bray, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support) (Graydon, Scot)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece) Modified on 9/23/2019 (SSch). [DOCUMENT IS A RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS]
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Brief Supporting MTD filed by Barbara Ashmore, Carolyn Bray, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas. (Graydon, Scot)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Barbara Ashmore, Carolyn Bray, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas. (Attachments: #1 Prop Order) (Graydon, Scot)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (NAhm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
August 22, 2019 Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Geaniece D Carter [E-filer]. (NAhm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Geaniece D Carter [E-filer] [APPROVED] (NAhm)
August 20, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Geaniece D. Carter at P.O. Box 361184, Grosse Pointe Farms, MI 48236. (DTof)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Geaniece D. Carter. (DPer)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Geaniece D. Carter against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. University of Texas at Dallas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Texas at Dallas
Represented By: Scot M Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Fair
Represented By: Scot M Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ashmore
Represented By: Scot M Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Bray
Represented By: Scot M Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geaniece D. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geaniece D Carter [E-filer]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?