Trinity Health Corporation et al v. Anesthesia Associates of Ann Arbor, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Trinity Health - Michigan and Trinity Health Corporation
Defendant: Siromed Physician Services, Inc. and Anesthesia Associates of Ann Arbor, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12403
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice and Without Costs or Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau)
September 5, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 09/19/2019 is Cancelled re #15 Notice of Hearing on Motion - ***PARTIES FILED A STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE ON 09/05/2019*** (CCie)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING on #13 Defendants' MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (THac)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: #13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (BSau)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Moore, Gregory)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Moore on behalf of All Defendants. (Moore, Gregory)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Doyle on behalf of All Defendants. (Doyle, Peter)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Kennison on behalf of All Defendants. (Kennison, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory L. Curtner on behalf of All Defendants. (Curtner, Gregory)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Stephen J. Murphy and III, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (NAhm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Siromed Physician Services, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Ettinger, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Anesthesia Associates of Ann Arbor, PLLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Ettinger, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Siromed Physician Services, Inc.* (DPer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Anesthesia Associates of Ann Arbor, PLLC* (DPer)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trinity Health - Michigan (Ettinger, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trinity Health Corporation (Ettinger, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Damages filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7364754 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 2:19-cv-12145-LVP-RSW, Judge Linda V. Parker] (Ettinger, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trinity Health Corporation et al v. Anesthesia Associates of Ann Arbor, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siromed Physician Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Kennison
Represented By: Gregory W. Moore
Represented By: Gregory L. Curtner
Represented By: Peter E. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anesthesia Associates of Ann Arbor, PLLC
Represented By: Matthew P. Kennison
Represented By: Gregory W. Moore
Represented By: Gregory L. Curtner
Represented By: Peter E. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Health - Michigan
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Health Corporation
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?