Boykin v. Inglewood Condominium Association et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Boykin
Defendant: EquityExperts.Org,LLC and Inglewood Condominium Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv12404
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by EquityExperts.Org,LLC identifying Corporate Parent EE Holdings for EquityExperts.Org,LLC. (DeMarte, Katrina)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by EquityExperts.Org,LLC. (DeMarte, Katrina)
August 19, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 08/19/2019 is Cancelled (DTof)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER FOR STAY OF FORECLOSURE - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Henry on behalf of Inglewood Condominium Association. (Henry, Benjamin)
August 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina Marie DeMarte on behalf of EquityExperts.Org,LLC. (DeMarte, Katrina)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Inglewood Condominium Association* (DWor)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *EquityExperts.Org,LLC* (DWor)
August 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Paul D. Borman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/16/2019, Set Deadlines/Hearings:( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 8/19/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Paul D. Borman)*PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CONFERENCE CALL WITH DEFENSE COUNSEL AND THE COURT* (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (DTof)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brenda Boykin against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7364835 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Exhibit Deed, #4 Exhibit Lien, #5 Exhibit Bylaws, #6 Exhibit Foreclosure Notice, #7 Exhibit Ledgers from EquityExperts, #8 Exhibit Letter to EquityExperts, #9 Exhibit Westlaw Document, #10 Document Continuation) (Feinberg, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boykin v. Inglewood Condominium Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Boykin
Represented By: Daniel P. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EquityExperts.Org,LLC
Represented By: Katrina Marie DeMarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inglewood Condominium Association
Represented By: Benjamin J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?