Schroeder et al v. ProMedica Health System Inc. d/b/a ProMedica Center for Autism at Bixby Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Schroeder and Cody Wright, individually and as next friend to MW, a minor
Defendant: Megan Pawson, John and Jane Does 1-100, Erinn Tiede, Melissa Schlotterer, Emily Walworth, Emily Siefker, Heather Bryant, Sarah Jean Phillips, Ashleigh Sancrant Neill and ProMedica Health System Inc. d/b/a ProMedica Center for Autism at Bixby Hospital
Case Number: 2:2019cv12416
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Kamenec on behalf of ProMedica Health System Inc. d/b/a ProMedica Center for Autism at Bixby Hospital, Melissa Schlotterer. (Kamenec, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Bryant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED ORDER For Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gouri G. Sashital on behalf of Heather Bryant. (Sashital, Gouri)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane J. Andreou on behalf of ProMedica Health System Inc. d/b/a ProMedica Center for Autism at Bixby Hospital, Melissa Schlotterer. (Andreou, Diane)[APPEARANCE IS FOR JENNIFER ANDREOU] Modified on 10/1/2019 (NAhm).
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Weaver on behalf of ProMedica Health System Inc. d/b/a ProMedica Center for Autism at Bixby Hospital, Melissa Schlotterer. (Weaver, Michael)
September 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED ORDER To Extend Time for Defendants Pawson, Walworth and Seifker to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn E. Jones on behalf of Megan Pawson, Emily Siefker, Emily Walworth. (Jones, Kathryn)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gouri G. Sashital on behalf of Megan Pawson, Emily Siefker, Emily Walworth. (Sashital, Gouri)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ProMedica Health System Inc. d/b/a ProMedica Center for Autism at Bixby Hospital served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Bonanni, Megan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sarah Jean Phillips served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Pitt, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Megan Pawson served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Pitt, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Heather Bryant served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Pitt, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Erinn Tiede served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Pitt, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Emily Walworth served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Pitt, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Emily Siefker served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Pitt, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ashleigh Sancrant Neill served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Pitt, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Pitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Pitt, Michael)
August 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Heather Bryant, Ashleigh Sancrant Neill, Megan Pawson, Sarah Jean Phillips, ProMedica Health System Inc. d/b/a ProMedica Center for Autism at Bixby Hospital, Melissa Schlotterer, Emily Siefker, Erinn Tiede, Emily Walworth* (SKra)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7367221 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Lenawee - County Where Action Arose: Lenawee - County of 1st Defendant: Lenawee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Bonanni, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schroeder et al v. ProMedica Health System Inc. d/b/a ProMedica Center for Autism at Bixby Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Pawson
Represented By: Gouri G. Sashital
Represented By: Kathryn E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erinn Tiede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Schlotterer
Represented By: Robert G. Kamenec
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Represented By: Diane J. Andreou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Walworth
Represented By: Gouri G. Sashital
Represented By: Kathryn E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Siefker
Represented By: Gouri G. Sashital
Represented By: Kathryn E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Bryant
Represented By: Gouri G. Sashital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Jean Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashleigh Sancrant Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProMedica Health System Inc. d/b/a ProMedica Center for Autism at Bixby Hospital
Represented By: Robert G. Kamenec
Represented By: Michael D. Weaver
Represented By: Diane J. Andreou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Schroeder
Represented By: Megan Bonanni
Represented By: Michael L. Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Wright, individually and as next friend to MW, a minor
Represented By: Megan Bonanni
Represented By: Michael L. Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?