Hall v. Lafontaine Buick GMC of Ann Arbor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Hall
Defendant: Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., Auto Trakk, L.L.C., Carite of Michigan, LLC, Ally Bank and Lafontaine Buick GMC of Ann Arbor, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12426
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Hall of all claims with prejudice (Taub, Adam)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #17 Notice of Appearance by Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc. (Green, Richard)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Green on behalf of Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc.. (Green, Richard)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Hall as to Carite of Michigan, LLC only, without prejudice (Taub, Adam)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Time for Defendant Ally Bank to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 10/19/2019.) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MacKay, K)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Extending Time for Auto Trakk, L.L.C. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 10/19/2019.) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MacKay, K)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ally Bank identifying Corporate Parent Ally Financial Inc. for Ally Bank. (Ostroff, Ethan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff on behalf of Ally Bank. (Ostroff, Ethan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Kundmueller on behalf of Ally Bank. (Kundmueller, Mark)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, by Auto Trakk, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Green, Richard)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Attorney Appearance by Auto Trakk, L.L.C. (Green, Richard)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard A. Green appearing on behalf of Auto Trakk, L.L.C. (Green, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lafontaine Buick GMC of Ann Arbor, Inc. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Taub, Adam)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Taub, Adam)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Carite of Michigan, LLC served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Taub, Adam)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Auto Trakk, L.L.C. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Taub, Adam)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ally Bank served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Taub, Adam)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ally Bank, Auto Trakk, L.L.C., Carite of Michigan, LLC, Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., Lafontaine Buick GMC of Ann Arbor, Inc.* (SKra)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Hall against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7367961 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Taub, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Lafontaine Buick GMC of Ann Arbor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Trakk, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carite of Michigan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff
Represented By: Mark D. Kundmueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafontaine Buick GMC of Ann Arbor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hall
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?