Haynes et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Benjamin Bischoff, Matthew Brownlee, Stephen Leszczynski, Robert Raney, Jamar Haynes, David Polley, Cassandra Morrison and Scott Whitehill
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv12427
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg to District Judge Sean F. Cox. (NAhm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ford Motor Company (Douglas, Stephanie)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Douglas, Stephanie)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. McKeever on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (McKeever, Susan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ford Motor Company served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Berman, Steve)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT filed in Traditional Manner by All Plaintiffs. (NAhm)
August 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (SKra)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits in the Traditional Manner. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits in the Traditional Manner by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7367974 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Gwinnett - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 19-2901, Judge Sean F. Cox] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 (2-23-15 EPA Letter re Determination & Use of Vehicle Road-Load Force & Dynamometer Settings), #3 Exhibit 2 (2-21-19 (NY Times - Ford is Investigating Emissions & Fuel Efficiency Data), #4 Exhibit 3 (News Wheel - 2019 Ford Ranger Most Fuel-Efficient in its Class), #5 Exhibit 4 (Ford Media - Ford Ranger Rated Most Fuel Efficient Gas Powered Midsize Pickup), #6 Exhibit 5 (MP4 video - filed in traditional manner), #7 Exhibit 6 (MP4 video - filed in traditional manner), #8 Exhibit 8 (AdAge - Ford Takes Targeted Mktg. Approach for Ford Ranger Comeback), #9 Exhibit 9 (Car & Driver - 2019 Ford Ranger MPG), #10 Exhibit 10 (Ford 2019 10Q Excerpts), #11 Exhibit 11 (NY Times - Ford Says Justice Dept. Has Opened Criminal Inquiry), #12 Exhibit 12 (Autoweek - VW Emissions Defeat Device & Past Offenses by Honda, GM & Ford), #13 Exhibit 14 (Tfltruck.com Article - EPA Says the New Ford Ranger Gets 24 MPG), #14 Exhibit 15 (Google Search & Related Searches for Ford F150 Fuel Economy), #15 Exhibit 16 (CarMax - 8 Best Ranked MPG Trucks of 2019), #16 Exhibit 17 (Ford Media - Ford Surpasses One Million Truck Sales in 2018), #17 Exhibit 18 (F-150 2.7 VG Monroney Sticker), #18 Exhibit 19 (2019 Ford Ranger Brochure), #19 Exhibit 20 (cnet.com article - 2018 Ford F-150 touts best-in-class towing, payload, fuel economy), #20 Exhibit 21 (2018 Ford F-150 Brochure)) (Berman, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Bischoff
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Brownlee
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Leszczynski
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Raney
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar Haynes
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Polley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Morrison
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Whitehill
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Susan M. McKeever
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?