Lucio v. Halo Country, LLC
Plaintiff: Lola Lucio
Defendant: Halo Country, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12456
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh Plaintiff shall arrange conference call with defendant and the court at telephone #313-234-5175 (MBea)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Halo Country, LLC. (Fraser, Joseph)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Halo Country, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Monismith, Pete)
August 21, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Halo Country, LLC* (SKra)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lola Lucio against Halo Country, LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7373029 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Genesee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Monismith, Pete)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucio v. Halo Country, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola Lucio
Represented By: Pete M. Monismith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halo Country, LLC
Represented By: Joseph N. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?