Murad et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maryann Murad and The National Federation of the Blind, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12578
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Amazon.com, Inc. waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Salvatore, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James Thomas Fetter on behalf of Maryann Murad, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc.. (Fetter, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Jovi May on behalf of Maryann Murad, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc.. (May, Anthony)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve Lynn Hill on behalf of Maryann Murad, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc.. (Hill, Eve)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The National Federation of the Blind, Inc. (Salvatore, Jennifer)
September 3, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Amazon.com, Inc.* (SOso)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Maryann Murad, The National Federation of the Blind, Inc. against Amazon.com, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7388890 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Salvatore, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murad et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Murad
Represented By: Jennifer B. Salvatore
Represented By: Eve Lynn Hill
Represented By: James Thomas Fetter
Represented By: Anthony Jovi May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Federation of the Blind, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Salvatore
Represented By: Eve Lynn Hill
Represented By: James Thomas Fetter
Represented By: Anthony Jovi May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?